CO SB177 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning amending the definition of "hard cider" as it relates to the regulation of alcohol beverages to harmonize with federal law.
Title
Hard Cider Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Postpone Senate Bill 20-177 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-177 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-177 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |