CO SB174 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the criteria to be considered in a sunset review hearing.
Title
Sunset Review Hearing Criteria
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Buckner [D] | Rep. Chris Kennedy [D] | Sen. Kerry Donovan [D] | Sen. Julie Gonzales [D] |
Sen. Dominick Moreno [D] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-25 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |