CO SB173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Offer Hepatitis C Screening Testing
Title
Offer Hepatitis C Screening Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-173 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-173 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-173 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |