CO SB171 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Hearing: May 1 @ 8:15 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Hearing: May 1 @ 8:15 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization for the restoration of the North American wolverine in the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Restoration of Wolverines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-171 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-171, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-171, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-171, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-171, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-171, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |