CO SB168 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Triggers For General Fund Obligations
Title
Triggers For General Fund Obligations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-168 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-168 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-168 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-168 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-04-26 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-25 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2012-04-24 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-19 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-04-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | |
2012-04-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-09 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-30 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |