CO SB167 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning increasing consumer access to electric motor vehicles by allowing manufacturers to sell their own electric motor vehicles directly to consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Motor Vehicle Manufacturer And Dealer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.010) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-167 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-11HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-09HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
2020-02-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-02-24SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-02-18SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-167
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_167_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_167_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_167_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_167_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_167_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_167_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f17b73760258c4b872585120074f006-sb20-167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-167vote60dad1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-167vote5cb5db
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-167vote5da11d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/168d489197b2f81587258526006b89c4-sb20-167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-167vote5401a4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/168d489197b2f81587258526006b89c4-sb20-167-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-167vote59470b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-167vote59673d

Bill Comments

feedback