CO SB167 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities
Title
Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |