CO SB166 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-19)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the implementation of recommendations from the Colorado fire commission, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Fire Commission Recommendations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-166 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-166, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-25HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-05HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
2021-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-166
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_166_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_166_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_166_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_166_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_166_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_166_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB166_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB166_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB166_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB166_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB166_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb166_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb166_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0166_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0166_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb166_r2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/de78f92405f23ae7872586a3006cf355-sb21-166-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1bd4e635e1da23c7872586c0004f99e4-sb21-166-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-166vote5a92ac
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1bd4e635e1da23c7872586c0004f99e4-sb21-166-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1bd4e635e1da23c7872586c0004f99e4-sb21-166-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b85bd63a5b46f91c872586cc005f2a2b-sb21-166-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2342077c63525d7872586e0004e2648-sb21-166-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2342077c63525d7872586e0004e2648-sb21-166-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-166vote79a118
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-166vote719753
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-166vote719f71

Bill Comments 750

feedback