CO SB162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room 0107
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room 0107
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning best practices for responding to discriminatory conduct in schools, and, in connection therewith, developing training consistent with the best practices and making an appropriation.
Title
Best Practices to Prevent Discrimination in Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Amended |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |