CO SB161 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Charter School Collaboratives
Title
Charter School Collaboratives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-161, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-161, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-161, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-161, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-10 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-06 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations | |
2010-04-26 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |