CO SB160 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-14 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-14 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning records related to complaints of discriminatory workplace practices.
Title
Records of Workplace Discrimination Complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-160 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |