CO SB151 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on June 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on June 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning telecommunications security, and, in connection therewith, requiring the division of homeland security and emergency management within the department of public safety to promulgate rules related to the removal, discontinuance, or replacement of critical telecommunications infrastructure that utilizes equipment manufactured by a federally banned entity.
Title
Telecommunications Security
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-151 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-151 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-151, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-151 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-151 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-151, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |