CO SB150 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room 0112
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room 0112
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements for the processing of municipal solid waste in the state.
Title
Processing of Municipal Solid Waste
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Cutter [D] | Sen. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D] | Rep. Meg Froelich [D] | Sen. Rhonda Fields [D] |
Sen. Julie Gonzales [D] | Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] | Sen. Faith Winter [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 24-150, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 24-150, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 24-150, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/07/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |