CO SB148 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of certain benefits through the "State Employee Group Benefits Act" for dependents of a state employee who dies in a work-related death.
Title
Medical Benefits After State Employee Work-related Death
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 12 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 12 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |