CO SB144 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-8)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-8)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prescription drugs for the treatment of chronic pain.
Title
Prescription Drugs For Chronic Pain
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 23-144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 23-144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |