CO SB143 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Local Business Database Ofc Economic Development
Title
Local Business Database Ofc Economic Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-143 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-143 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, with a favorable recommendation to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, with a favorable recommendation to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, with a favorable recommendation to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, with a favorable recommendation to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-143 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-143 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, with a favorable recommendation to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, with a favorable recommendation to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, with a favorable recommendation to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-143, as amended, with a favorable recommendation to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Lay Over Amended | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-02 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |