CO SB143 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dept Of State Cash Fund Refunds
Title
Dept Of State Cash Fund Refunds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-143 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended with recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-143, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended with recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-143, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-05 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-26 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-05 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |