CO SB139 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental On-line Education Services
Title
Supplemental On-line Education Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139, as amended, to the Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer amended bill to Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Motion to reconsider the previous vote on Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer amended bill to Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Motion to reconsider the previous vote on Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139, as amended, to the Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) to Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139, as amended, to the Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer amended bill to Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Motion to reconsider the previous vote on Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer amended bill to Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Motion to reconsider the previous vote on Senate Bill 13-139 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-139, as amended, to the Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |