CO SB133 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recycle Electronic Devices Divert From Landfills

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recycle Electronic Devices Divert From Landfills

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-133 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-133 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 12-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 12-133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-20 Governor Action - Signed
2012-04-13 Sent to the Governor
2012-03-21 House Third Reading Passed
2012-03-20 House Second Reading Passed
2012-03-19 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-03-14 House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-03-05 Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
2012-02-29 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-02-28 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-02-20 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-02-15 Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-01-31 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BE40677619E5656187257981007F374C?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BE40677619E5656187257981007F374C/$FILE/133_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BE40677619E5656187257981007F374C/$FILE/133sagr_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BE40677619E5656187257981007F374C/$FILE/133_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BE40677619E5656187257981007F374C/$FILE/133_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BE40677619E5656187257981007F374C/$FILE/133_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BE40677619E5656187257981007F374C/$FILE/133_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BE40677619E5656187257981007F374C/$FILE/133_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BAF684EACEF00439872579A500695D59
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9E3FDF6CF9D219AB872579A500691A3C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/826E89F3EDEABFF9872579A50069340A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/01F0B67F699DE99F872579A5006946A0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BAF684EACEF00439872579A500695D59
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9E3FDF6CF9D219AB872579A500691A3C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/826E89F3EDEABFF9872579A50069340A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/01F0B67F699DE99F872579A5006946A0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/66B07788510FB82D872579C100663296
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/66B07788510FB82D872579C100663296

Bill Comments

feedback