CO SB133 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Income Tax Credit For Rehiring Employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credit For Rehiring Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 10-133 indefinitely (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-133, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-133, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-05 House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
2010-04-27 House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2010-04-21 House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2010-04-08 Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Finance
2010-04-05 Senate Third Reading Lost
2010-04-05 Senate Third Reading Reconsidered
2010-04-05 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-03-26 Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-03-25 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-23 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-03-19 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-02-16 Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
2010-02-03 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/97C4A0096048A409872576AC006B10BC?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/97C4A0096048A409872576AC006B10BC/$FILE/133_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/97C4A0096048A409872576AC006B10BC/$FILE/133sblt_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/97C4A0096048A409872576AC006B10BC/$FILE/133sbltapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/97C4A0096048A409872576AC006B10BC/$FILE/133BAL_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/97C4A0096048A409872576AC006B10BC/$FILE/133_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/97C4A0096048A409872576AC006B10BC/$FILE/133_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/53B2EEBBD4E7CA51872576CC0066A500
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CECDAC6E02B4A9E7872576EB004CF6CB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6291F9AC784873918725771200693E38
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/156880F961DAE8EC8725771A007E30B2

Bill Comments

feedback