CO SB130 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Personal Care Allowance Nursing Facility
Title
Increase Personal Care Allowance Nursing Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-130, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-22 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |