CO SB129 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-16)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning establishing a pilot program to reduce the suicide rate among veterans, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veteran Suicide Prevention Pilot Program

Sponsors

Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]Rep. David Ortiz [D]Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]
Sen. John Cooke [R]Sen. Donald Coram [R]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]
Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]Sen. Bob Gardner [R]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]
Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]
Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Pete Lee [D]Sen. Larry Liston [R]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]
Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Robert Rankin [R]
Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D]Sen. Ray Scott [R]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]
Sen. Jerry Sonnenberg [R]Sen. Tammy Story [D]Sen. Faith Winter [D]Sen. Rob Woodward [R]
Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]
Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]Rep. Thomas Exum [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]
Rep. Alec Garnett [D]Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]
Rep. Edith Hooton [D]Rep. Dominique Jackson [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]
Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Susan Lontine [D]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]
Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]Rep. Shane Sandridge [R]
Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]
Rep. Donald Valdez [D]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Dave Williams [R]Rep. Mary Young [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-129, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-129, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-129 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-129, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-129, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-129, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-129, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23 Governor Signed
2021-06-18 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-17HouseHouse Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
2021-05-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-07SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-07SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-18SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-129
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_129_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_129_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_129_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_129_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_129_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_129_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB129_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB129_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB129_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB129_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB129_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB129_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb129_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0129_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb129_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0129_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f387689db81805908725869c00593ec1-sb21-129-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f387689db81805908725869c00593ec1-sb21-129-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f387689db81805908725869c00593ec1-sb21-129-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f387689db81805908725869c00593ec1-sb21-129-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/477384c40c59776d872586ce005120f1-sb21-129-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/477384c40c59776d872586ce005120f1-sb21-129-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/477384c40c59776d872586ce005120f1-sb21-129-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-129vote5bb039
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/912e575562333cfb872586d80072c0fb-sb21-129-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2225ed730d9c1984872586e8004fe034-sb21-129-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-129vote730844
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-129vote0edbc8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-129vote0ef16b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2225ed730d9c1984872586e8004fe034-sb21-129-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback