CO SB126 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the conservation easement income tax credit, and, in connection therewith, extending the conservation easement oversight commission and the certified holder program indefinitely, increasing the limit on conservation easement income tax credits available to donors in one calendar year, allowing multiple transfers of conservation easement income tax credits, and making an appropriation.
Title
Conservation Easement Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment G). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment G). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-126, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-22 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |