CO SB126 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning credentialing of physicians as participating physicians in health coverage plan provider networks, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Timely Credentialing Of Physicians By Insurers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-126 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-126 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-126 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-126 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-126, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-18 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |