CO SB125 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Energy & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a prohibition on the use of certain exotic animals in a traveling animal act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit Exotic Animals In Traveling Performances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Postpone Senate Bill 20-125 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-125, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-125, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
2020-02-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
2020-02-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-20SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-13SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback