CO SB124 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a class 2 felony offense when the death of a person is caused by a participant without deliberation in the course of the commission of specified felony offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes To Felony Murder

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-124 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26 Governor Signed
2021-04-16 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-07HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2021-03-31SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-03-29SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-03-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2021 - No Amendments
2021-03-24SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-03-23SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-03-18SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-02-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-124
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_124_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_124_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_124_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_124_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_124_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_124_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB124_L.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb124_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb124_r1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0178a65bd99864d28725869c0075618d-sb21-124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-124vote564ba8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2922d0e88230e14b872586b0007a7593-sb21-124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-124vote54c42e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0178a65bd99864d28725869c0075618d-sb21-124-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback