CO SB123 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a high school diploma endorsement for biliteracy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seal Of Biliteracy For High School Diplomas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-123 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-123 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30 Governor Signed
2017-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-03-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-03-15SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-03-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/15/2017
2017-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2017 - No Amendments
2017-03-02HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2017-02-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-02-15SenateSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2017-02-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-02-14SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2017-02-08SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-01-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-123
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_123_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_123_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_123_rn2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_123_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_123_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_123_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sed2017a2017-02-08t114608z-sb17-123-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#221
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hed2017a2017-02-27t133017z-sb17-123-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#400
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#441

Bill Comments

feedback