CO SB115 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Water Plan Public Review & GA Approval
Title
State Water Plan Public Review & GA Approval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.008 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.008 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-25 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-07 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2014-03-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |