CO SB112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cap 2012-13 School Land Revenues Transfers
Title
Cap 2012-13 School Land Revenues Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-112 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-112 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-112 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-112 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-112 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-112 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-112 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-04 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |