CO SB110 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibiting prior authorization for antipsychotic prescription drugs used to treat a mental health condition, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Medicaid Prior Authorization Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-110 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-110 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |