CO SB108 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning gas pipeline safety, and, in connection therewith, increasing and clarifying the rule-making and enforcement authority of the public utilities commission, and making an appropriation.
Title
Public Utilities Commission Gas Utility Safety Inspection Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-108 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-108 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/06/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |