CO SB108 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a prohibition on a landlord engaging in certain activities related to a tenant's citizenship status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord Prohibitions Tenant Citizenship Status

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Postpone Senate Bill 20-108 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: This is a conceptual amendment (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
2020-02-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2020-02-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-31SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-28SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-108
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_108_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_108_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_108_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dee91c982ca49b01872584fd0075a475-sb20-108-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-108vote5eeb31
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4d5e48c74e1c50187258575007033f4-sb20-108-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dee91c982ca49b01872584fd0075a475-sb20-108-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dee91c982ca49b01872584fd0075a475-sb20-108-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dee91c982ca49b01872584fd0075a475-sb20-108-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback