CO SB107 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a Pikes Peak international hill climb special license plate, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Pikes Peak International Hill Climb License Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 22-107 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 22-107 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 22-107 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 22-107 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |