CO SB104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that the broadband deployment board file a petition with the federal communications commission to seek a waiver from the commission's rules prohibiting a state entity from applying for certain federal money earmarked for financing broadband deployment in remote areas of the nation.
Title
Federal Funds For Rural Broadband Deployment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |