CO SB102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of specific dental hygienist functions, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2020 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Dental Hygienists Specialized Functions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-102 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-102 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |