CO SB102 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal Crime Of Criminal Libel
Title
Repeal Crime Of Criminal Libel
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Brophy [R] | Rep. B.J. Nikkel [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-102 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-102 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-102 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-102 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-102 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-102 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-102 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-28 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-02-20 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |