CO SB100 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Council On Higher Ed
Title
Sunset Council On Higher Ed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-100 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-100 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-100 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-17 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |