CO SB100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cross-boundary Energy Improvement Dist
Title
Cross-boundary Energy Improvement Dist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-100 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-100 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-04-12 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-09 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-07 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-23 | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy | |
2010-02-15 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-02 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-01-28 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy |