CO SB097 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the presumption that a conveyance of an interest in land also conveys an interest in adjoining property consisting of a vacated right-of-way.
Title
Vacated Alleys Presume Included In All Deeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-097 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-097 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |