CO SB094 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify State Sales Tax Definition Of Food
Title
Clarify State Sales Tax Definition Of Food
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Hodge [D] | Rep. Libby Szabo [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment ) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - consent calendar. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-094 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - consent calendar. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-094 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment ) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-094, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - consent calendar. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-094 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - consent calendar. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-094 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-20 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-15 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |