CO SB091 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning support of peace officers involved in a use of force incident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Support Peace Officers Involved In Use Of Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-091, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt conceptual amendment to remove paragraphs (c) and (d) of the legislative declaration. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-091, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-091, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-091, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23 Governor Signed
2019-04-18 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-03HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-01HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-25HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/25/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-12HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-02-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-06SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-04SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-091
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_091_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_091_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_091_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_091_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_091_rr2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_091_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cdf4059583a691ab87258397007ca48a-sb19-091-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cdf4059583a691ab87258397007ca48a-sb19-091-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cdf4059583a691ab87258397007ca48a-sb19-091-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-091vote6061c2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ece32331eb28981b872583b70002f7c5-sb19-091-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ece32331eb28981b872583b70002f7c5-sb19-091-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ece32331eb28981b872583b70002f7c5-sb19-091-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-091vote55a0ee
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-091vote5e6cc6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-091vote5e8cb9

Bill Comments

feedback