CO SB091 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Board Veterinary Medicine
Title
Sunset Board Veterinary Medicine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-91 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-91 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-91 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amd (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-91 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-91 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-91 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-06 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-03 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-29 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-18 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-17 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources + Appropriations |