CO SB089 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suppl Approp Dept Of Health Care Pol & Fin
Title
Suppl Approp Dept Of Health Care Pol & Fin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-089 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-089 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-089 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-02-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |