CO SB088 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adoption of the "Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act".
Title
Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.016) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.016) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |