CO SB087 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning agricultural workers' rights, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Agricultural Workers' Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.107) (Y: 23 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.100) (Y: 23 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.093 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.092 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.089 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.084 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.080 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.107) (Y: 23 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.100) (Y: 23 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.093 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.092 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.089 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.084 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.080 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-06-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-03 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |