CO SB087 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring central service technicians to possess professional credentials.
Title
Require Credentials Central Service Technicians
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Sen. Kyle Mullica [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-087 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |