CO SB085 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that a sex offender being placed in a community corrections program meet certain requirements for a sex offender being released on parole.
Title
Sex Offender Community Corrections Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/11/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |