CO SB085 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Cottage Foods Act
Title
Small Business Cottage Foods Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft conference committee report CLSB 085.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft conference committee report CLSB 085.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft conference committee report CLSB 085.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | House Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint |
2015-03-09 | Senate | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |