CO SB083 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Probate Code Omnibus
Title
Probate Code Omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-30 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-21 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-25 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |