CO SB077 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adoption of an interstate compact to allow a person who is a licensed professional counselor in the person's state of residence to practice professional counseling in a compact state in which the person is not licensed, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselor Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-077 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 22-077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-077 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 22-077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-077, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-077, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-077 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 22-077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-077 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 22-077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-077, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-077, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-31 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |